Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFREEDOM WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02143
Date Filed2019-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffFREEDOM WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionFreedom Watch submitted a FOIA request in 2011 to the Department of Defense for records concerning UFOs. The agency did not respond to Freedom Watch's request until March 2019, releasing records that Freedom Watch deemed largely non-responsive to its request. Freedom Watch filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal and told Freedom Watch that there were already 1600 appeals in front of theirs. Freedom Watch then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6263820) filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klayman, Larry) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/19/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-22Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zeg) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-222SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-313REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-014SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar