Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNew York Immigration Coalition et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv06693
Date Filed2019-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ronnie Abrams
PlaintiffNew York Immigration Coalition
PlaintiffImmigrant Justice Corps
Case DescriptionThe New York Immigration Coalition and Immigrant Justice Corps submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning processing and adjudication of Application for Employment Authorization Documents. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing from the agency, the New York Immigration Coalition and Immigrant Justice Corps filed an administrative appeal of the agency's failure to respond. After hearing nothing further, the NYIC and IJC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-181COMPLAINT against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17267117)Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition, Immigrant Justice Corps.(Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-182CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-183RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Immigrant Justice Corps.(Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-184RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition.(Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-185REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Immigrant Justice Corps, New York Immigration Coalition. (Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-186NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle A. Dandelet on behalf of Immigrant Justice Corps, New York Immigration Coalition. (Dandelet, Kyle) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-19CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-19Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-19Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-197ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (jgo) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-238ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference August 30, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than August 23, 2019, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. Please consult my Individual Rules and Practices with respect to communications with Chambers and related matters. Plaintiffs are ordered to serve Defendant with a copy of this Order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/23/2019) (ama) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-239LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jeffrey A. Rosenthal dated July 23, 2019. Document filed by Immigrant Justice Corps, New York Immigration Coalition.(Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-2410ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO RE-FILE THE CORRECTED COMPLAINT WITH EXHIBITS: granting 9 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Letter Motion requesting leave to file the corrected Complaint and supporting exhibits, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs are granted permission to file the corrected Complaint with exhibits. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/24/2019) (ama) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-2411COMPLAINT against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition, Immigrant Justice Corps. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - May 14, 2018 FOIA Request to USCIS, # 2 Exhibit B - May 14, 2018 FOIA Request to DHS, # 3 Exhibit C - May 16, 2018 Letter from DHS to Plaintiffs, # 4 Exhibit D - May 25, 2018 Letter #1 from USCIS to Plaintiffs, # 5 Exhibit E - May 25, 2018 Letter #2 from USCIS to Plaintiffs, # 6 Exhibit F - April 24, 2019 Appeal of USCIS' Constructive Denial, # 7 Exhibit G - April 30, 2019 Letter Denying Plaintiffs' FOIA Appeal Request)(Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-2612AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition, Immigrant Justice Corps. (Rosenthal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar