Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGerber Legendary Blades Division, Fiskars Brands, Inc. v. U.S. AbilityOne Commission
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2019cv00936
Date Filed2019-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Liam O'Grady
PlaintiffGerber Legendary Blades Division, Fiskars Brands, Inc.
DefendantU.S. AbilityOne Commission
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-181Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6745899.), filed by Gerber Legendary Blades Division, Fiskars Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Document filed in error and removed re Civil Cover Sheet)(Belevetz, Timothy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/18/2019) (klau, ). Modified text on 7/18/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-182Document filed in error and removed re Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint by Gerber Legendary Blades Division, Fiskars Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Document filed in error and removed re Proposed Summons, # 2 Document filed in error and removed re Proposed Summons)(Belevetz, Timothy) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/18/2019) (klau, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/18/2019) (klau, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/18/2019) (klau, ). Modified text on 7/18/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-18Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, ) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-18Notice of Correction re [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Proposed Summons, The filing user has been notified that document 1-1, 2, 2-1, 2-2 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document.(klau, ) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-183Civil Cover Sheet by Gerber Legendary Blades Division, Fiskars Brands, Inc.. (Belevetz, Timothy) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-184Proposed Summons for U.S. AbilityOne Commission by Gerber Legendary Blades Division, Fiskars Brands, Inc.. (Belevetz, Timothy) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-185Proposed Summons for U.S. AbilityOne Commission (Attorney General) by Gerber Legendary Blades Division, Fiskars Brands, Inc.. (Belevetz, Timothy) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-186Proposed Summons for U.S. AbilityOne Commission (Civil Process Clerk) by Gerber Legendary Blades Division, Fiskars Brands, Inc.. (Belevetz, Timothy) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-197Proposed Summons for U.S. AbilityOne Commission (Civil Process Clerk) by Gerber Legendary Blades Division, Fiskars Brands, Inc.. (Belevetz, Timothy) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-198Summons Issued for service by SPS as to U.S. AbilityOne Commission, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-08-079NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Davis Schnell on behalf of Gerber Legendary Blades Division, Fiskars Brands, Inc. (Schnell, Joshua) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-0710SUMMONS Returned Executed/CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to U.S. Attorney served on 7/22/19, answer due 8/21/19 by Gerber Legendary Blades Division, Fiskars Brands, Inc. re 8 Summons Issued as to USA, (Schnell, Joshua) Modified text on 8/7/2019 and set answer due date(klau, ). (Entered: 08/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar