Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREED SMITH LLP v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02155
Date Filed2019-07-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffREED SMITH LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Reed Smith LLP submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning the agency's investigation of pacemaker implantations at Scripps Memorial Hospital in La Jolla, CA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Reed Smith that it did not find any responsive records in its Los Angeles district field office but was still searching the Center for Medical Devices. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Reed Smith filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-191COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6266427) filed by REED SMITH LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Segroves, James) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by REED SMITH LLP (Segroves, James) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-23Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zeg) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-233SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-244REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE TO ATTORNEY GENERAL AND US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE re 1 Complaint, filed by REED SMITH LLP. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by REED SMITH LLP.(Segroves, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-265SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 7/29/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/29/2019. (Segroves, James) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-317RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/28/2019. (Segroves, James) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-318RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Segroves, James) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar