Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWestern Watersheds Project v. Bureau of Land Management
DistrictDistrict of Idaho
CityDatabaseVersion 6.2.2 Boise - Southern
Case Number1:2019cv00283
Date Filed2019-07-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Candy W. Dale
PlaintiffWestern Watersheds Project
Case DescriptionThe Western Watersheds Project submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the January 2019 decision of Secretary Ryan Zinke to reissue the grazing permit for Hammond Ranches. WWP also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told WWP that it was being placed in the "others" category for fee purposes and that its request was being put in the complex track for processing. WWP made several inquiries to check on the status of its request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WWP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBureau of Land Management
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-191COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1915312.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Summons FOIA Summons, # 2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Talasi)
2019-07-192Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Brooks, Talasi)
2019-07-23CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The summons filed with the complaint 1 is not the correct summons form. Please refile the summons using the form located on the courts webpage. You may contact the court with directions on resubmitting the summons. (jd)
2019-07-243Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management (Print attached Summons for service.) (km)
2019-07-304LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on October 28, 2019, at 11:00 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9945 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before October 21, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (jd) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-025AMENDED COMPLAINT as of Right against Bureau of Land Management, filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint showing markup)(Brooks, Talasi)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar