Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWestern Resources Legal Center v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration et al
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2019cv01119
Date Filed2019-07-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge John V. Acosta
PlaintiffWestern Resources Legal Center
DefendantNational Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
DefendantNational Marine Fisheries Service
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-191Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5931465 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Western Resources Legal Center against National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons). (Lobdell, Caroline) Modified docket text on 7/19/2019 to update defendants. (eo) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-192Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Lobdell, Caroline) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-193Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher J. Carr . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5931568. Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A) (Lobdell, Caroline) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-194Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Navtej Singh Dhillon . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5931584. Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A) (Lobdell, Caroline) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-225Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 11/19/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/19/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/19/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-226Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued) (sss) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-227ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Carr for Western Resources Legal Center. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5931568 issued. Signed on 7/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) Modified on 7/25/2019 to correct date of signature(ecp). (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-228Notification of CM/ECF Account for Christopher J. Carr ( Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: cjcarr . Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-229ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Navtej S. Dhillon for Western Resources Legal Center. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5931584 issued. Signed on 7/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-2510Notification of CM/ECF Account for Navtej S. Dhillon ( Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: nsdhillon . Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar