Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02172
Date Filed2019-07-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wildhorse Freedom Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management concerning emails, email attachments, and faxes sent to Holle Waddell, the Off-Range Branch Chief for BLM's Wild Horse & Burro Program for August 2018. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told WFF several times that it was processing the requests. After hearing nothing further the agency, WFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-231COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6272285) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-24Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-242SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-313STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/31/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar