Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02206
Date Filed2019-07-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wildhorse Freedom Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for emails, email attachments, and faxes sent to and from James Cason, Associate Deputy Secretary of the Department of the Interior from August 7 through August 15, 2018. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. WFF sent a number of emails to the agency inquiring about the status of its request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-241COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6276197) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Malone, Sean) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-26Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-262SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-08-023NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar