Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02214
Date Filed2019-07-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention for records concerning calendar entries and attachments for CDC Director Robert Redfield. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told American Oversight that its request was too broad to conduct a search. American Oversight responded that it believed the request was not too broad to conduct a search. American Oversight then filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantCENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-251COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6277344) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons as to USAO, # 4 Summons as to AG, # 5 Summons as to HHS, # 6 Summons as to CDC)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-26Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zjd) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-263SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-264STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 07/26/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-08-095NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Marie Anthony on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar