Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02233
Date Filed2019-07-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the agency's recent revisions of its FOIA regulations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR a federal agency within the U.S. Department of the Interior
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR a federal agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-261COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6281407) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Comments on Rule, # 3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Correspondence, # 4 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 5 Summons Attorney General, # 6 Summons Office of the Secretary of the Interior, # 7 Summons Department of the Interior, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Declaration Regarding Rule LCvR26.1)(Wilcox, Stuart) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (zjd) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-26Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zjd) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-263SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-08-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/1/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/31/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons)(Wilcox, Stuart) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar