Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02254
Date Filed2019-07-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning communications between John Kelly during the time he served as Secretary of Homeland Security and White House Chief of Staff. CREW's first request asked for communications between Kelly and Comprehensive Health Services, related entities, and detention facilities in Homeland, FL which housed detained migrants and was funded by the Administration for Children and Families. The agency told CREW its request was too broad and even after CREW protested, the agency ultimately closed the request. CREW's second request asked for communications between Kelly and a list of named individuals from January 2019 to the present. The agency told CREW that it was unable to search without an email address. CREW responded that an email address was not required to conduct a search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-291COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6284297) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons HHS, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons USAO)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-29Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zjd) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-08-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/2/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/5/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/4/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/5/19. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-145NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-146Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-14MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its answer by September 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 14, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/18/2019. (tj) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar