Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02267
Date Filed2019-07-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted two FOIA requests to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys and the Office of Information Policy for records concerning any investigations into other individuals involved in the campaign finance violations to which Michael Cohen had pled guilty in the Southern District of New York. CREW also sought expedited processing and a fee waiver for both requests. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests and both EOUSA and OIP denied CREW's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from either agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-301COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6286637) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-302LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-08-01Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/6/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/6/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/5/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/6/2019 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-095STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/09/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-236AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-307Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 6 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-09-04MINUTE ORDER granting 7 unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer to amended complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by no later than September 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/4/2019. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 9/13/2019. (mac) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar