Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGARCIA RODRIGUEZ et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02285
Date Filed2019-07-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffARTURO GARCIA RODRIGUEZ
PlaintiffELIDIA HERNANDEZ JARAMILLO
Case DescriptionArturo Garcia Rodriguez and Elidia Hernandez Jaramillo submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning their visa applications. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency located 16 pages responsive to their requests but withheld them under Exemption 3 (other statutes). Garcia Rodriguez and Hernandez Jaramillo filed administrative appeals of the denials. The agency's Appeals Review Board told Garcia Rodriguez and Hernandez Jaramillo that it was upholding the original decision. Garcia Rodriguez and Hernandez Jaramillo then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-311COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6290081) filed by ARTURO GARCIA RODRIGUEZ, ELIDIA HERNANDEZ JARAMILLO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOS, # 3 Summons AUSA, # 4 Summons AG)(Hampe, Carl) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-01Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-012SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-063RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/5/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/4/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service - AG, # 2 Affidavit of Service - USAO)(Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/5/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/5/2019. (See Docket Entry 3 to view document) (tth) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-084NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Pierce on behalf of ARTURO GARCIA RODRIGUEZ, ELIDIA HERNANDEZ JARAMILLO (Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-266MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-27MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a response, if any, to Defendant's 6 Motion for Extension of Time by August 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/27/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-297RESPONSE re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ARTURO GARCIA RODRIGUEZ, ELIDIA HERNANDEZ JARAMILLO. (Hampe, Carl) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-29MINUTE ORDER granting in part Defendant's 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of Defendant's 6 Motion and Plaintiffs' 7 Response, the Court finds that Defendant has not demonstrated the good cause necessary for an extension beyond the 21 days to which Plaintiffs have provided consent. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint by September 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/29/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-09-068NOTICE of Appearance by John Cuong Truong on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Truong, John) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar