Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBROWN v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATE ATTORNEYS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02303
Date Filed2019-07-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffRAJAHN BROWN
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATE ATTORNEYS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-29Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/29/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-07-291COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATE ATTORNEYS filed by RAJAHN BROWN.(zmc) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-07-292MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RAJAHN BROWN (zmc) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-07-293PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by RAJAHN BROWN (zmc) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-304ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff is obligated to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $97.33 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/30/2019. (zad) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-08-30Case Reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zad) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-055ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATE ATTORNEYS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) Modified on 9/9/2019 (zrdj). (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-09NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error (Incorrect Summons used) and FOIA summons was re-issued and delivered to the USMS. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-096SUMMONS (3) REISSUED as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATE ATTORNEYS, and non-parties U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (zrdj). (Entered: 09/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar