Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBRITT v. TRUMP et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02310
Date Filed2019-07-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffROBERT J. BRITT
DefendantDONALD TRUMP Chief Executive Officer of the United States Office of the President
DefendantWILLIAM BARR United States Attorney General, Department of Justice
DefendantSUSAN B. GERSON Assistant Director, Office of the United States Attorneys
DefendantJOHN DOE Assistant Director, Office of Information Policy
DefendantDAVID L. HARLOW Deputy Director, United States Marshal Service
DefendantWILLIAM E. BORDLEY Associate General Counsel, United States Marshal Service
DefendantJOHN DOE Director of the Bureau of Prisons, Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-29Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/29/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-07-291COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BARR, WILLIAM E. BORDLEY, JOHN DOE(Director of the Bureau of Prisons, Department of Justice), JOHN DOE(Assistant Director, Office of Information Policy), SUSAN B. GERSON, DAVID L. HARLOW, DONALD TRUMP filed by ROBERT J. BRITT. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zmc) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-07-292MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT J. BRITT (zmc) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-303ORDER that within thirty (30) days from the filing date of this Order, the plaintiff shall provide the requested information in this order (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/30/2019. (zad) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar