Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmericans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2019cv23261
Date Filed2019-08-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beth Bloom
PlaintiffAmericans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.
Case DescriptionAmericans for Immigrant Justice submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning policies dealing with minors who turn 18 while in ICE custody. AI Justice also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension in which to respond. The agency also denied AI Justice's request for a fee waiver. AI Justice filed an administrative appeal of the delay and the denial of a fee waiver. The agency responded to AI Justice's appeal by indicating that it would not be able to process the request on time. AI Justice then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-051COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11876288, filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Summon(s), # 4 Summon(s), # 5 Summon(s), # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Norris, Allison) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-052Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-063Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Justice, Office of the United States Attorney. (amb) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-204CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit)(Norris, Allison) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-08-215Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-09-046Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-047PAPERLESS ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants shall file their Response/Answer to the Complaint by September 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar