Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAnimal Legal Defense Fund v. Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv04567
Date Filed2019-08-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffAnimal Legal Defense Fund
Case DescriptionThe Animal Legal Defense Fund submitted a FOIA request to the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning Farmers' Inn, a wildlife zoo operated by Kimberly Lucas. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ADLF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAnimal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-061COMPLAINT against Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13586663.). Filed byAnimal Legal Defense Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Monson, Alexandra) (Filed on 8/6/2019) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-062Proposed Summons. (Monson, Alexandra) (Filed on 8/6/2019) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-063Certificate of Interested Entities by Animal Legal Defense Fund (Monson, Alexandra) (Filed on 8/6/2019) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-074Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/21/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-095Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-096Summons Issued as to Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-137Proposed Summons. (Monson, Alexandra) (Filed on 8/13/2019) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-138Proposed Summons. (Monson, Alexandra) (Filed on 8/13/2019) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-149Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-2010CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Animal Legal Defense Fund.. (Monson, Alexandra) (Filed on 8/20/2019) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-09-1111Proposed Summons. (Monson, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/11/2019) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-1112Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-1213CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Animal Legal Defense Fund to U.S. Attorney General William Barr (Monson, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/12/2019) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-1214CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Animal Legal Defense Fund to United States Department of Agriculture (Monson, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/12/2019) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar