Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCARROLL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2019cv03568
Date Filed2019-08-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG
PlaintiffWESLEY CARROLL
Case DescriptionWesley Carroll, a state prisoner, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice. He appealed the denial of his request but after the agency failed to provide the records, Carroll filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 7 - Law enforcement records

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-061MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY WESLEY CARROLL.(ahf) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-062COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, filed by WESLEY CARROLL. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(ahf) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-063PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-06Institution address for SCI-WAYMART used per DOC Policy CD-ADM 803. (ahf) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-134ORDER THAT CARROLL'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (IFP) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND CARROLL A BLANK IFP FORM. IF CARROLL SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER, COMPLETE THE IFP FORM AND FILE IT WITH THE CLERK ALONG WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT, OR SUBMIT THE $400 FILING FEE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/13/2019.8/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH IFP FORMS.(amas) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar