Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02376
Date Filed2019-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban Development and the Federal Housing Finance Agency for records concerning communications that senior officials at both agencies had with Thomas Barrack, Richard LeFrak, and Steven Roth, or representative of their companies. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from either agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DefendantFEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-071COMPLAINT against FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6306057) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons U.S. Att'y General, # 4 Summons HUD, # 5 Summons FHFA)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-07Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-073SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-164NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-09-095ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/8/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/7/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY served on 8/14/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 8/14/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar