Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMUSLIM ADVOCATES v. UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02396
Date Filed2019-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffMUSLIM ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionMuslim Advocates submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the processing and revocation of Trusted Traveler credentials. Muslim Advocates also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Muslim Advocates filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CUSTOM AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6309001) filed by MUSLIM ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons - United States Custom And Border Protection, # 5 Summons - United States Attorney's Office, District Of Columbia, # 6 Summons - United States Attorney General)(Zdeb, Sara) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Zdeb, Sara) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-083NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MUSLIM ADVOCATES. Case related to Case No. 1:17-cv-00820. (Zdeb, Sara) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-084MOTION To Use P.O. Box In Complaint Caption re 1 Complaint, by MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zdeb, Sara) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-08Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zeg) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-085SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/12/2019. (Zdeb, Sara) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 8/12/2019 (Zdeb, Sara) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/12/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/11/2019. (Zdeb, Sara) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-299NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Leviss on behalf of MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Leviss, David) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-2910NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MUSLIM ADVOCATES. Attorney Sara S. Zdeb terminated. (Zdeb, Sara) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar