Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS et al v. UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02401
Date Filed2019-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffREPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
PlaintiffCOMMITTEE TO PROTECT JOURNALISTS
Case DescriptionThe Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and the Committee to Protect Journalists submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning a report in the New York Times that CBP agent Jeffrey Rambo, who was working at the agency's office in Sterling, Virginia, contacted POLITICO reporter Ali Watkins to ask her to reveal her sources for a story on the increase in Russian espionage in the U.S. The Reporters Committee also requested inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing from the agency, the Reporters Committee and the Committee to Protect Journalists filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6310110) filed by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, COMMITTEE TO PROTECT JOURNALISTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Corporate Disclosure for CPJ, # 5 Summons Summons for Defendant, # 6 Summons Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 7 Summons Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/9/2019) (zeg). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/9/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COMMITTEE TO PROTECT JOURNALISTS (zeg) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-09-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/15/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/15/2019. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/6/2019) (ztd). (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 9/9/2019 (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/10/2019) (ztd). (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-166ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar