Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWhittecar v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
DistrictDistrict of Wyoming
CityCheyenne
Case Number2:2019cv00164
Date Filed2019-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Scott W Skavdahl
PlaintiffHoward R Whittecar
Case DescriptionHoward Whittecar, a disabled Navy veteran, submitted a FOIA request through his attorney to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning his VA file. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but claimed that providing the records to Whittecar's attorney would be an invasion of privacy. Whittecar's attorney filed an administrative appeal. The agency upheld its initial decision to deny the records. Whittecar then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Veterans Affairs
DefendantDepartment of Veterans Affairs Secretary in his official capacity
also known as Robert Wilkie
DefendantUnited States Department of Veterans Affairs Secretary in his official capacity
also known as Robert Wilkie
DefendantDepartment of Veterans Affairs General Counsel in his official capacity
also known as James Byrne
DefendantUnited States Department of Veterans Affairs General Counsel in his official capacity
also known as James Byrne
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-081COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Howard R Whittecar (4 summonses issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY031412) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-152NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Albert Kenneth Walsh on behalf of Howard R Whittecar (Walsh, Albert) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-153First SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard R Whittecar. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 8/12/2019, answer due on 09/11/2019. Served through the Mark A. Klaassen/U.S. Attorney's Office for District of Wyoming. (Walsh, Albert) Modified answer date on 8/15/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg). (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: United States Department of Veterans Affairs answer due 9/11/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-154NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Howard R Whittecar ; this case is non-complex. (Walsh, Albert) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-09-095NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C Levi Martin on behalf of United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Veterans Affairs General Counsel, United States Department of Veterans Affairs Secretary (Martin, C) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-096MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendants United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Veterans Affairs General Counsel, United States Department of Veterans Affairs Secretary. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Martin, C) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-107ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time (Court Staff, sem) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar