Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02413
Date Filed2019-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning the agency's decisionmaking on Affordable Care Act enrollment outreach. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-091COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6311988) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Lewis, John) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Lewis, John) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zeg) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES served on 8/14/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/14/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/21/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/20/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Lewis, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-275NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar