Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFLETE-GARCIA v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02382
Date Filed2019-08-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffFULVIO FLETE-GARCIA
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-06Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/06/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-294ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, except to the extent that Plaintiff is required to make the payments set forth (please see order for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/26/2019. (zad) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/29/2019) (zad). (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-30Case assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss (zmc) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-08-305STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in this Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/30/19. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar