Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02478
Date Filed2019-08-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffMURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT a Virginia non-profit organization
Case DescriptionThe Murder Accountability Project submitted six FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the Department of Defense, and the Department of the Interior for data concerning the murder rate for Native Americans. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, MAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
935 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20535
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantNATIONAL PARK SERVICE
DefendantBUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS
DefendantU.S. NAVY
DefendantU.S. ARMY
DefendantU.S. AIR FORCE
DefendantDEFENSE MANPOWER DATA CENTER
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-151COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6325743) filed by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Summons Dept. of Justice, # 10 Summons FBI, # 11 Summons Dept. of Defense, # 12 Summons Dept. of Interior, # 13 Summons National Park Service, # 14 Summons Bureau of Indian Affairs, # 15 Summons U.S. Navy, # 16 Summons U.S. Army, # 17 Summons U.S. Air Force, # 18 Summons Defense Manpower Data Center, # 19 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 20 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-20Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-08-203SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, DEFENSE MANPOWER DATA CENTER, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. AIR FORCE, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-08-214MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas R. Burke, :Firm- Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP, :Address- 505 Montgomery Street, Suite 800, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-276-6500. Fax No. - 415-276-6599 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6334602. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas R. Burke, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-22MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave of Thomas R. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/22/19. (DMK) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-225NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Burke on behalf of MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/21/2019. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEFENSE MANPOWER DATA CENTER served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-278RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-279RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-2710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-2711RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-2712RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. NAVY served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-2813RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/15/2019. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-2914RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/22/2019 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-3015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ARMY served on 8/27/2019 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-09-1816NOTICE of Appearance by Alan R. Burch on behalf of All Defendants (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar