Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02482
Date Filed2019-08-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffNATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION
Case DescriptionThe National Parks Conservation Association submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior and the National Park Service for records concerning the agency's decision to keep certain parks open during the government shutdown. NPCA also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Concerned about the possibility of another government shutdown in the future, NPCA submitted updated FOIA requests asking for expedited processing as well. The NPS granted NPCA's request for expedited processing. However, after hearing nothing further from either Interior or NPS, NPCA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantNATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-161COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6326955) filed by NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attach A - 1-28-19 DOI and NPS FOIA, # 2 Exhibit Attach B - 2-21-19 JOTR FOIA, # 3 Exhibit Attach C - 7-8-19 DOI and NPS Supp FOIA, # 4 Exhibit Attach D - 7-8-19 JOTR Supp FOIA, # 5 Exhibit 7-8-19 DOI and Attach E - 7-8-19 NPS Requst to Expedite, # 6 Exhibit Attach F - 7-8-19 JOTR Request to Expedite, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons Attorney General, # 9 Summons US Attorney, # 10 Summons Department of Interior, # 11 Summons National Park Service)(Watts, Ryan) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION (Watts, Ryan) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-20Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-08-203SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-09-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/26/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/25/2019. (Watts, Ryan) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/26/2019. (Watts, Ryan) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 8/23/2019 (Watts, Ryan) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-047RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE served on 8/23/2019 (Watts, Ryan) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar