Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKlenk v. National Transportation Safety Board
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityFt. Myers
Case Number2:2019cv00568
Date Filed2019-08-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas P. Barber
PlaintiffTimothy C. Klenk
Case DescriptionTimothy Klenk submitted a FOIA request to the National Transportation Safety Board for records concerning the results of tests conducted by the University of Southampton on the cockpit voice recorder of TWA 800. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency withheld records under Exemption 5 (privileges). Klenk then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantNational Transportation Safety Board
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-121COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against National Transportation Safety Board Filing fee $400, receipt number FtM013962 filed by Timothy C. Klenk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3-A, # 5 Exhibit 3-B, # 6 Exhibit 3-C, # 7 Exhibit 3-D, # 8 Exhibit 3-E, # 9 Exhibit 3-F, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-122SUMMONS issued as to National Transportation Safety Board. (RMT) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-133STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/13/2019. (MLJ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-264RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/26/2019. (WRW) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-265INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/9/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2019. (WRW) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-09-056NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Timothy C. Klenk. Related case(s): n. (MLJ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar