Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOsorio-Rama v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictWestern District of Michigan
CitySouthern Division
Case Number1:2019cv00648
Date Filed2019-08-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Paul L. Maloney
PlaintiffMartin Osorio-Rama
Case DescriptionMartin Osorio-Rama submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and subsequently told Osorio-Rama that it would take 3-6 months to process his request. Osorio-Rama then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-131COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection filed by Martin Osorio-Rama (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - postal records, # 2 Exhibit B - acknowledgement letter, # 3 Exhibit C - FOIA case status) (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-13FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiff Martin Osorio-Rama in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4506283 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-132PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-143NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-144SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (clw) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-225SUMMONS returned executed on Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Department of Homeland Security complete on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; United States Customs and Border Protection complete on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration regarding service) (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-09-166PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadline to File Response by defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection [Attorney Laura Ann Babinsky added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Ann Babinsky added to party United States Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft)] (Babinsky, Laura) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-177ORDER approving STIPULATION 6 ; deadline for defendant to file responsive pleading extended to 10/7/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar