Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHill v. Pleasanton Police Department et al
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CitySan Antonio
Case Number5:2019cv00998
Date Filed2019-08-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Xavier Rodriguez
PlaintiffCedrc Earl Hill, Jr.
Case DescriptionCedric Hill filed suit against the Pleasanton Police Department. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantPleasanton Police Department, .
DefendantEarnest J. Venegas Individual Capacity
DefendantKia Viesca Individual Capacity
DefendantJordan Harden Individual Capacity
DefendantErnest Guerra Individual Capacity
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-16THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (fs) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-16CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. (fs) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-161MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cedrc Earl Hill, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (fs) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-09-172ORDER HOLDING IN ABEYANCE re 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cedrc Earl Hill, Jr., IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, Hill shall file a more definite statement of the claims he seeks to present to this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT service of Hills Complaint is STAYED until the Court receives and reviews Hills more definite statement and orders service to be had. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk shall send a Copy of this Order to Hill by Regular Mail and Certified Mail, return receipt requested.. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: # 1 Supplement Standard IFP Application) (wg). (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-173Certified Mail Receipt of 2 Order, & IFP Application, also sent Via Regular Mail. (wg) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar