Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMISCHLER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02493
Date Filed2019-08-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMY MISCHLER
Case DescriptionAmy Mischler, who alleged she had been wrongly accused of child abuse by the Commonwealth of Kentucky, submitted a FOIA request for records concerning her situation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told Mischler that it found no responsive records. Mischler filed an administrative appeal of the no records decision. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to her request, Mischler filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantALEX M. AZAR, II Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-121COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES filed by AMY MISCHLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-12SUMMONS Not Issued as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (ztd) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-20Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number: 4616100265. (ztd) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-08-282ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of her obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court, including rules regarding service of process. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to : AMY MISCHLER 1120 Palm Court, Okeechobee, FL 34974. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/28/19. (DJS) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-09-123Summons (2) Issued as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (ztd) (ztd). (Entered: 09/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar