Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWESTERN VALUES PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02527
Date Filed2019-08-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffWESTERN VALUES PROJECT
Case DescriptionWestern Values Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning communications between Secretary David Bernhardt and a number of outside companies, individuals, or organizations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Western Values Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6333480) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons U.S. Att'y General, # 4 Summons U.S. Dep't of the Interior)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-26Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-274STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/27/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-09-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/27/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/26/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/3/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 9/3/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar