Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02531
Date Filed2019-08-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning GIS data, including metadata, relating to onshore federal oil and gas. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and eventually told CBD that all the data was available online. CBD filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-211COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6334251) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attorney General of United States, William Barr, # 2 Summons Bureau of Land Management, # 3 Summons United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-223CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY re 2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, 1 Complaint, . (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-26Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-264SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar