Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJadhav v. National Institutes of Health
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2019cv02422
Date Filed2019-08-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul W. Grimm
PlaintiffAjit Jadhav
Case DescriptionAjit Jadhav, a former scientist at the National Institute of Health, submitted a FOIA request to the agency for records concerning the activities of the agency's National Center for Advancing Transactional Sciences. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Jadhav filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantNational Institutes of Health
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-221COMPLAINT against National Institutes of Health ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8192888.), filed by Ajit Jadhav. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General Barr, # 3 Summons US Attorney Hur, # 4 Summons National Institutes of Health)(Zapf, William) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-222Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Joseph NA R Goodwin on 8/22/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-223Summons Issued 21 days as to National Institutes of Health.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-274SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ajit Jadhav. National Institutes of Health served on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019.(Zapf, William) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-275MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah R. Fink (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8201777.) by Ajit Jadhav(Zapf, William) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-286PAPERLESS ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sarah R Fink. Directing attorney Sarah R Fink to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/28/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-09-137MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer A. Short (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8231789.) by Ajit Jadhav(Fink, Sarah) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-168PAPERLESS ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jennifer Anne Short. Directing attorney Jennifer Anne Short to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 9/16/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar