Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02562
Date Filed2019-08-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between former Attorney General Jeff Sessions and others in his office with U.S. Attorney for the District of Utah John Huber, who had been directed by Sessions to investigate various matters. American Oversight also requested communications involving DOJ, Huber, and Rep. Mark Meadows (R-NC). The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys told American Oversight that it did not find any records pertaining to communications between Huber and Meadows. American Oversight filed an administrative appeal of that decision. After hearing nothing further pertaining to any of the requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-261COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6340401) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-27Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-09-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/28/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/27/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/3/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/3/2019 (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar