Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02572
Date Filed2019-08-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES
Case DescriptionAsian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning documentation related to the implementation of the agency's new Notice to Appear policy for notification of eligibility for deportation and statistics related to the issuance of NTAs from 2012 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told Advancing Justice-L.A. that DHS had no records and its request should properly be addressed to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Advancing Justice-L.A. filed an administrative appeal of the no records response. After hearing nothing further from the agency Advancing Justice-L.A. filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-261COMPLAINT against All Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6342481) filed by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-262NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-00411. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-28Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zeg) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-09-034STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 3, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-03MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the plaintiff to show cause, by September 10, 2019, why this case should not be consolidated with 19-cv-411 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 3, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 9/10/2019. (tg) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-105MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John C. Trang, :Firm- Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Los Angeles, :Address- 1145 Wilshire Blvd, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Phone No. - 213-241-0225. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6369284. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-106MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laboni Hoq, :Firm- Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Los Angeles, :Address- 1145 Wilshire Blvd, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Phone No. - 213-977-5211. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6369384. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-107Civil Statement of Non-Opposition to Consolidation from Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Los Angeles. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-108RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/28/2019. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-109RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/09/2019. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-1010RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/6/2019 (Cohen, David) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice . Mr. Trang and Ms. Hoq may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 10, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-10Motions terminated: 5 , 6 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 10, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar