Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePark v. Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms and Explosives
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CityTacoma
Case Number3:2019cv05789
Date Filed2019-08-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ronald B. Leighton
PlaintiffRonald J Park
on behalf of Friedman | Rubin PLLP
Case DescriptionRonald Park, an attorney representing the Estate of Carolyn Lee Parsons, who died as a result of the mass shooting at Las Vegas, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning the seller of the rifle used by the Las Vegas shooter. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Park filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms and Explosives
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-261COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives (Receipt # 0981-5900110), filed by Ronald J Park. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Complaint, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons - ATF, # 9 Summons - DOJ, # 10 Summons - US Atty W Dist of WA)(Park, Ronald) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-272NOTICE TO FILER re 1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ERA) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-27Judge David W. Christel added. (ERA) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-273Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives (main document). (Attachments: # 1 Summons - DOJ, # 2 Summons - US Atty W Dist of WA) (ERA) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-274NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KB) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-285MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings as this matter is related to 3:19-cv-05702-RBL. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to this case. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, at the direction of David W. Christel. (TW) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-09-106ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-107ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/25/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/2/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar