Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02577
Date Filed2019-08-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning communications between Secretary Alex Azar and a number of drug companies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told American Oversight that the agency could not search for communications with the various companies without an identifying domain name. American Oversight responded by telling the agency that while identifying domain names was not necessary, it provided an attachment that had the domain names for most of the companies. American Oversight also told the agency that its searches should go beyond just the domain names. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-271COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6343678) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons as to USAO, # 10 Summons as to AG, # 11 Summons as to HHS)(Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-28Case assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmc) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/29/2019) (zmc). (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-09-104NOTICE of Appearance by John Moustakas on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/28/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/27/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/3/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 9/3/2019 (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar