Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02578
Date Filed2019-08-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas F. Hogan
PlaintiffELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Frontier Foundation submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security. EFF's first request was submitted to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the use of GPS tracking devices on vehicles crossing the border and training manuals for using GPS tracking devices on the U.S. border. EFF's second FOIA request was submitted to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the use of GPS tracking devices on the U.S. borders and training for such use of GPS tracking devices. For both requests, EFF requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, EFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6344009) filed by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons DHS, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons Office of the US Attorney, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION (Sobel, David) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-29Case assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zmc) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-09-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/5/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/5/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/4/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/5/2019. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar