Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePhelan v. Housing and Urban Development
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityFort Worth
Case Number4:2019cv00677
Date Filed2019-08-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Terry R Means
PlaintiffHarold L. Phelan on behalf of Kimberly P. Mayfield
Case DescriptionHarold Phelan, an attorney representing Kimberly Mayfield, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning Mayfield's EEO complaint. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and disclosed 244 pages in four separate emails. The agency redacted records under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Phelan filed an administrative appeal of the decision. The agency denied Phelan's appeal, claiming he had not shown any public interest in disclosure of the redacted information. Phelan then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantHousing and Urban Development
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-281COMPLAINT against Housing and Urban Development filed by Harold Phelan. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10226170) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Cover Sheet) (Mayfield, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-282CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harold Phelan. (Mayfield, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-293New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-294Summons Issued as to Housing and Urban Development. (wxc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/30/2019) (wxc). (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-09-135SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Housing and Urban Development ; served on 9/6/2019. (Mayfield, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar