Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZAVALA RIVAS v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02626
Date Filed2019-08-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJOSE PEDRO ZAVALA RIVAS
Case DescriptionJose Pedro Zavala Rivas submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for Immigration Review at the Department of Justice for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency Zavala Rivas filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-08-301COMPLAINT under FOIA against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6352227) filed by JOSE PEDRO ZAVALA RIVAS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 FOIA request, # 3 Exhibit 2 Receipt, # 4 Summons to EOIR, # 5 Summons to USAG, # 6 Summons to USAtty)(Messer, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-09-05Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-052SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-133AMENDED COMPLAINT for writ of mandamus and FOIA against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW filed by JOSE PEDRO ZAVALA RIVAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 MTR 1998)(Messer, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar