Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02656
Date Filed2019-09-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted FOIA requests to the EPA and the FDA for records concerning communications between the EPA, the FDA, and the Centers for Disease Control pertaining to the use of several antibiotics in pesticides. CBD had received records in response to a separate FOIA request to the CDC that identified a study pertaining to the pesticide use. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-051COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6358723) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, # 4 Summons U.S. Food and Drug Administration, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-09Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-093SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-134NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Carter Evans on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Evans, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/17/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/17/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 9/16/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-09-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 9/17/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Connor, Hannah) (Entered: 09/26/2019)
2019-10-079NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-1710ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-17MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by November 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/17/19. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/1/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar