Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGulyas v. Kaiser
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2019cv01699
Date Filed2019-09-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Cynthia Bashant
PlaintiffChristopher C. Gulyas
Case DescriptionChristopher Gulyas filed suit against Edwin Kaiser, a captain in the Navy in Superior Court in California. This is a request to move the case to the case from federal court to state court. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantEdwin Kaiser Captain, U.S. Navy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-061NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00028908-SC-SC-CTL., No Fee Required, filed by Edwin Kaiser. (Attachments: # 1 Civil cover sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - State court complaint) The new case number is 3:19-cv-01699-BAS-KSC. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(jmo) (jao). (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-062CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwin Kaiser re 1 Notice of Removal, (Hoffman, Kyle). (jah). (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-093ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Removal. Court orders the United States to show cause as to why removal is timely. Order to Show Cause Response due by 9/20/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/6/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-124RESPONSE re 3 Order to Show Cause Re: Removal filed by Edwin Kaiser. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proof of Service)(Hoffman, Kyle). (jah). (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-125*** WITHDRAWN BY FILER PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT 8 *** NOTICE Amended Notice of Removal by Edwin Kaiser re 1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hoffman, Kyle). Modified on 9/16/2019 - Wrong event. QC Email sent to refile using correct event (jah). Modified on 9/17/2019 - Edited to reflect as withdrawn (jah). (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-126Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Edwin Kaiser. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hoffman, Kyle). (jah). (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-167ORDER granting Defendant Edwin Kaiser's 6 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Notice of Removal. Defendant Edwin Kaiser shall file answer by 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/16/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-168NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Edwin Kaiser re 5 Notice (Other) filed by Edwin Kaiser. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hoffman, Kyle). (jah). (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-169AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Edwin Kaiser. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Hoffman, Kyle). (jah). (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-10-1810MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) by Edwin Kaiser. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hoffman, Kyle) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar