Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC et al v. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02700
Date Filed2019-09-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffNOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC
formerly known as EYE MACHINE, LLC
PlaintiffPETER POCKLINGTON
PlaintiffLANTSON E. ELDRED
PlaintiffAMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC
Case DescriptionNova Oculus Partners submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records about itself and its partners. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Nova Oculus filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-091COMPLAINT against United States Securites and Exchange Commission ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6367009) filed by NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, f/k/a THE EYE MACHINE, LLC, AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, PETER POCKLINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11)(Himes, Lisa) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/19/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-092NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, f/k/a THE EYE MACHINE, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON. Case related to Case No. 19-666. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-10Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zeg) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/13/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/13/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/13/19. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 9/13/2019 (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-197NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-10-038LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMC Holdings Co., LLC and by NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-109NOTICE of Appearance by Carin Marie Cozza on behalf of UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Cozza, Carin) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-1010ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Cozza, Carin) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-17MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before November 14, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 17, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar