Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNOEL v. EXPERIAN et al
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityNewark
Case Number2:2019cv17977
Date Filed2019-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Madeline Cox Arleo
PlaintiffSHAWN D. NOEL
Case DescriptionShawn Noel filed suit against Experian and Equifax, alleging they had disclosed his personal information. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantEXPERIAN
DefendantEQUIFAX INC.
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-131COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INC., EXPERIAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW040519), filed by SHAWN D. NOEL. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A, # 2 Schedule B, # 3 Schedule C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically)(ld, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-162SUMMONS ISSUED as to EQUIFAX INC., EXPERIAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-10-083Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney DOROTHY A. KOWAL for EXPERIAN added. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-084Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN identifying Experian plc as Corporate Parent.. (KOWAL, DOROTHY) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-09Clerk`s Text Order - The document 3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by EXPERIAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/29/2019. (ams, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-145Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Equifax Inc.. Attorney JONATHAN DANIEL KLEIN for EQUIFAX INC. added. (KLEIN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-146Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQUIFAX INC. identifying Equifax Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KLEIN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 10/14/2019)
2019-10-15Clerk`s Text Order - The document 5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by EQUIFAX INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/29/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar