Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZeigler v. United States Department of Agriculture
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityFlorence
Case Number4:2019cv02633
Date Filed2019-09-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge R Bryan Harwell
PlaintiffBenjamin T Zeigler
Case DescriptionBenjamin Zeigler submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning emails sent to or received by agency employee Kyle Daniel, as well as any complaints made about Daniel. The agency acknowledged receipt and asked Ziegler to provide keyword search terms for the emails. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Ziegler filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-181COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8674727), filed by Benjamin T Zeigler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -September 20, 2018 Request, # 2 Exhibit B - October 2, 2019 email, # 3 Exhibit C - November 19, 2018 email, # 4 Exhibit D - November 7, 2018 email, # 5 Exhibit E - January 3, 2019 email, # 6 Exhibit F - January 29, 2019 email, # 7 Exhibit G - February 19, 2019 email, # 8 Exhibit H - March 7, 2019 email, # 9 Exhibit I - September 10, 2019 email) (lsut, ) Modified on 9/19/2019 to add descriptions to Exhibits. (dsto) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-183Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Benjamin T Zeigler. (lsut, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-194Summons Issued as to United States Department of Agriculture. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 12/18/2019. (lsut, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-255NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Drake on behalf of United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency (Drake, Beth) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-10-116SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin T Zeigler. United States Department of Agriculture Farm Service Agency served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Ipock, Charles) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar