Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02814
Date Filed2019-09-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Treasury, the Department of Commerce, the Department of Housing and Urban Development, and the General Services Administration for records concerning communications between agency officials and the White House on topics of congressional oversight. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantGENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-191COMPLAINT against GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6385773) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-203SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-10-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/20/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/20/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/30/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 9/27/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 9/27/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 9/27/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 9/30/2019 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar