Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSarama v. Drug Enforcement Administration
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityJacksonville
Case Number3:2019cv01116
Date Filed2019-09-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Corrigan
PlaintiffDaniel Sarama
Case DescriptionDaniel Sarama submitted a FOIA request to the DEA for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated that it was being processed. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Sarama filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Drug Enforcement Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-301COMPLAINT against Drug Enforcement Administration (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15973986) filed by Daniel Sarama (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons)(Bauer, Galen). Modified on 10/1/2019 to notify counsel's office to re-file proposed Summons with correct case number (JSG). (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-302NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-1116-J-32JRK. (SJB) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-013PROPOSED summons to be issued by Daniel Sarama. (Bauer, Galen) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-024SUMMONS issued as to United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (JSG) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-285NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Joint notice due within 30 days of the appearance of defendant. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/28/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-056Consent MOTION to extend time to Respond to Complaint and Stay Case Deadlines by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Gibbons, Shea) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-067ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Defendants' Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. All deadlines are stayed until further Order. No later than 12/20/19 the parties shall file a status report regarding record production and the resolution of this case. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 11/6/2019. (MD) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar