Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24532250 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff ACLU of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request) (Attorney Matthew D Strugar added to party ACLU of Southern California(pty:pla))(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ACLU of Southern California. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 3 | CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ACLU of Southern California, (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 4 | CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff ACLU of Southern California (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 5 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff ACLU of Southern California. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 6 | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 7 | NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 8 | ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-08454 ODW (GJSx). (mrgo) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 9 | 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security. (ghap) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 10 | 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security. (ghap) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 11 | 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security. (ghap) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-10-04 | 12 | MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents (lc) (Entered: 10/07/2019) |
2019-11-15 | 13 | STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security.(Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party The United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Thayer, Damon) (Entered: 11/15/2019) |
2019-12-02 | 14 | STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 2/7/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thayer, Damon) (Entered: 12/02/2019) |
2019-12-03 | 15 | ORDER EXTENDING THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY TIME TORESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO FEBRUARY 7, 2020 14 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 12/03/2019) |
2020-02-06 | 16 | STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 04/07/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thayer, Damon) (Entered: 02/06/2020) |
2020-02-06 | 17 | ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY ADDITIONAL 60 DAYS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II,. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant United States Department of Homeland Security shall have an extension of time, up to and including April 7, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs complaint. (yl) (Entered: 02/07/2020) |
2020-04-06 | 18 | STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 09/08/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thayer, Damon) (Entered: 04/06/2020) |
2020-04-07 | 19 | ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY FIVE MONTHS 18 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant United States Department of Homeland Security shall have an extension of time, up to and including June 8, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. (lom) (Entered: 04/07/2020) |
2020-06-08 | 20 | ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security.(Thayer, Damon) (Entered: 06/08/2020) |
2020-06-09 | 21 | ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 10/5/ 2020 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 06/09/2020) |
2020-09-28 | 22 | JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 Day, filed by Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security.. (Thayer, Damon) (Entered: 09/28/2020) |
2020-09-29 | 23 | SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (BENCH TRIAL) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This Order is to advise the parties and counsel of the schedule that will govern this case. THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates: Bench Trial : 7/23/21 9:00 AM; Hearing on Motions in Limine: 7/12/21 1:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference: 6/28/21 1:30 PM. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. (lc) (Entered: 09/29/2020) |
2020-09-29 | 24 | ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for Settlement Conference. (lc) (Entered: 09/29/2020) |
2021-04-30 | 25 | STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by plaintiff ACLU of Southern California.(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 04/30/2021) |
2021-04-30 | 26 | MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to the Stipulation to Dismiss 25 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 2. Each party shall bear its own costs, fees, and expenses; and 3. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 04/30/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |