Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-10-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6923791)Attorney Jennifer E. Best added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 2 | Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 3 | SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 4 | MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02807-NYW. (athom, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 5 | Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-16 | 6 | MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/16/19. Consent Form due by 11/21/2019. Status Conference set for 12/5/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 10/16/2019) |
2019-10-18 | 7 | SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Fish and Wildlife Service served on 10/7/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/18/2019) |
2019-10-31 | 8 | STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant United States Fish and Wildlife Service. United States Fish and Wildlife Service answer due 11/20/2019. (Dickey, Lauren) (Entered: 10/31/2019) |
2019-11-18 | 9 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint, by Defendant United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Dickey, Lauren) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2019-11-19 | 10 | CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Friends of Animals All parties consent.. (Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/19/2019) |
2019-11-19 | 11 | ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/19/2019. United States Fish and Wildlife Service shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 12/11/2019. No further extensions will be permitted absent extraordinary circumstances. Furthermore, the Status Conference set for 12/5/2019 is VACATED and RESET for 12/17/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019) |
2019-12-05 | 12 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Friends of Animals (Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2019-12-05 | 13 | Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 12/5/19. Text Only Entry (nmarb, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |