Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02934
Date Filed2019-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State for records. The first FOIA request asked for communications between agency officials and Rudy Giuliani. The second FOIA request asked for communications between agency officials and former U.S. Ambassador to Ukraine Maria Yovanovitch. American Oversight also requested expedited processing for both requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees - Eligibility

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6408612) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/2/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-012LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-02Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-044MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Daniel McGrath)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-075NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Charles Abbuhl on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-116Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Eric Stein)(Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-177NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Kaiser Creighton on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-17MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to attend a telephonic conference on Thursday, October 17, 2019 at 4:00 PM. Dial-in information will be provided separately. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/17/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-17Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 4:00 PM before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-17Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/17/2019. The parties are to appear for a Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2019 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-188TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE before Judge Christopher R. Cooper held on October 17, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-7. Date of Issuance:October 18, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2020.(Moreira, Lisa) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-189REPLY to opposition to motion re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-2210NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-2311ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .SURREPLY to re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) Modified on 10/23/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-23Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/23/2019. Oral arguments submitted on Plaintiff's Motion 4 for Preliminary Injunction. Forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-23NOTICE OF ERROR re 11 Surreply; emailed to joshua.abbuhl@usdoj.gov, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. You must file a Motion for Leave to file a Surreply. The surreply must be attached as an exhibit to the motion. (ztd, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-2412NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-3058. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 10/24/2019)
2019-10-2513TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Christopher R. Cooper held on October 23, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-34. Date of Issuance:October 25, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2020.(Moreira, Lisa) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-2514RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/3/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/10/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/10/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-2515ORDER granting in part 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/25/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement (Joint Status Report) due by 10/30/2019. Further Joint Status Report due by 11/25/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-3016Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-11-0117OPINION and ORDER re: 16 Joint Status Report. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/1/2019. (lccrc3) Modified on 11/1/2019 (lsj). (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-0418ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Abbuhl, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar